No. 24A4
Title:Joseph M. Hoskins, Applicant
v.
Jared Withers, et al.
Docketed:July 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-4081)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2024Application (24A4) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 1, 2024 to October 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 03 2024Application (24A4) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Joseph M. Hoskins