No. 24A3
Title:Darnell Anderson, Applicant
v.
Aaron Fuson, et al.
Docketed:July 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5342)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2024Application (24A3) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 8, 2024 to August 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Jul 02 2024Application (24A3) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Darnell Anderson
    Counsel of Record
#38150-007
USP Tucson
P.O. Box 24550
Tucson, AZ 85734

Party name: Darnell Anderson