No. 24A26
Title:William Hudson, Applicant
v.
James T. Vaughn, Warden, et al.
Docketed:July 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2811)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2024Application (24A26) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 7, 2024.
Jul 11 2024Application (24A26) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 6, 2024 to October 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Hudson
    Counsel of Record
SBI00688958
James T. Vaughn Correctional Center
1181 Paddock Road
Smyrna, DE 19977

Party name: William Hudson