No. 24A25
Title:B.S., Applicant
v.
D.S.
Docketed:July 10, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A167778)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2024Application (24A25) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2024 to August 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Jul 11 2024Application (24A25) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 26, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Zarmi
    Counsel of Record
Zarmi Law
9194 W Olympic Blvd.191
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

davidzarmi@gmail.com
310-841-6455
Party name: B.S.