No. 24A2
Title:Usha Jain, et vir, Applicants
v.
Donald Myers, et al.
Docketed:July 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11908, 21-11719)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2024Application (24A2) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2024 to September 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Jul 03 2024Application (24A2) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 9, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Usha Jain4800 S. Apopka-Vineland Rd.
Orlando, FL 32819

(407) 876-5555
Party name: Usha Jain, et al.