No. 24A19
Title:Maxsony Coissy, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-14797)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2024Application (24A19) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2024 to September 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 09 2024Application (24A19) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 27, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

BRENDA_BRYN@FD.ORG
954-356-7436
Party name: Maxsony Coissy
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States