No. 24A16
Title:Jay Sandon Cooper, Applicant
v.
Texas
Docketed:July 9, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5-21-01002-CR)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2024Application (24A16) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2024 to August 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jul 10 2024Application (24A16) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Sandon Cooper
    Counsel of Record
4823 Blue Water Cir.
Granbury, TX 76049

(817) 771-0174
Party name: Jay S. Cooper