No. 24A14
Title:Kenneth W. Blair, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3573)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2024Application (24A14) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Jul 11 2024Application (24A14) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth W. Blair
    Counsel of Record
#21660-047
FCI Polluck
P.O. Box 4050
Polluck, LA 71467

Party name: Kenneth W. Blair
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States