No. 24A13
Title:Blue Mountains Biodiversity Project, an Oregon non-profit corporation, Applicant
v.
Shane Jeffries, in His Official Capacity as Ochoco National Forest Supervisor, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-35857)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2024Application (24A13) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2024 to September 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jul 10 2024Application (24A13) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 13, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Blue Mountains Biodiversity Project
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Shane Jeffries and United States Forest Service