No. 24A1118
Title:Shahriar Behnamian, Applicant
v.
Coke Morgan Stewart, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Acting Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Docketed:May 20, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2024-1139)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2025Application (24A1118) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 27, 2025 to July 26, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 21 2025Application (24A1118) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 26, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shahriar Behnamian43270 Sunderleigh Square
Broadlands, VA 20148

Shahriar.behnamian@gmail.com
(703) 999-2723
Party name: Shahriar Behnamian
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Stewart, Coke, et al.