No. 24A11
Title:Alaska, et al., Applicants
v.
Department of Education, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-3089)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2024Application (24A11) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Response to application (24A11) requested by Justice Gorsuch, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on July 17, 2024.
Jul 12 2024Letter to the Clerk from applicant Texas, et al., filed.
Main Document
Jul 15 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute, Kansas Justice Institute, and National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of Senators Mitch McConnel and Bill Cassidy, M.D. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance, Cato Institute, Mackinac Center for Public Policy, and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 17 2024Response to application from respondent Department of Education, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 17 2024Brief amicus curiae of Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Jul 19 2024Reply of State of Texas in support of application submitted.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph David Spate
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

josephspate@scag.gov
(803) 734-3371
Party name: South Carolina
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Lanora Christine PettitOffice of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Education, et al.
Other
Joshua Michael Divine
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: Counsel for Amici States
Michael Andrew Fragoso
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Republican Leader
The Capitol
S-230
Washington, DC 20510

michael_fragoso@mcconnell.senate.gov
202-224-1661
Party name: Senators Mitch McConnel and Bill Cassidy, M.D.
Sheng Tao Li
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW Suite 450
Washingtion, DC 20036

sheng.li@ncla.legal
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance, Cato Institute, Mackinac Center for Public Policy, and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur
925 Euclid Avenue, Suite 1700
Cleveland, OH 44115

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
4405037877
Party name: The Buckeye Institute, Kansas Justice Institute, and National Taxpayers Union Foundation