No. 24A1094 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Nicholas Noelani D. Smith, Applicant
v.
Alabama
Docketed:May 14, 2025
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-2022-0504)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2025Application (24A1094) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2025 to June 23, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 15 2025Application (24A1094) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 21, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Angela Leigh Setzer
    Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

ASETZER@EJI.ORG
334-269-1803
Party name: Nicholas Smith