No. 24A1091
Title:LaWanda D. Small, Applicant
v.
Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America, a Minnesota Corporation
Docketed:May 14, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-55821)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2025Application (24A1091) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 20, 2025 to June 19, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 15 2025Application (24A1091) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 19, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leslie Agnes Brueckner
    Counsel of Record
Singleton Schreiber, LLP
591 Camino De La Reina, Ste 1025
San Diego, CA 92108

lbrueckner@singletonschreiber.com
+1 6195731851
Party name: LaWanda Small