No. 24A1090 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Clarence Fry, Applicant
v.
Timothy Shoop, Warden
Docketed:May 13, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3270)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2025Application (24A1090) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 29, 2025 to July 28, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 13 2025Application (24A1090) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 28, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sharon Anne Hicks
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1660 W. Second Street
Suite 750
Cleveland, OH 44113-1455

SHARON_HICKS@FD.ORG
16145807731
Party name: Clarence Fry