No. 24A1088
Title:James Skinner, Applicant
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:May 12, 2025
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023 KW 0170)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 08 2025Application (24A1088) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2025 to July 25, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
May 13 2025Application (24A1088) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 25, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Easha Anand
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

eanand@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-3345
Party name: James Skinner