No. 24A1086
Title:Ali Al-Maqablh, Applicant
v.
Crystal Heinz, Individually and in Her Official Capacity as County Attorney of Trimble County, Kentucky, et al.
Docketed:May 9, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5935)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2025Application (24A1086) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2025 to July 13, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 10 2025Application (24A1086) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 13, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ali Al-Maqablh2901 Rio Rita Ave.
Apt #3
Louisville, KY 40220

(708) 945-4496
Party name: Ali Al-Maqablh