No. 24A1076
Title:MaChelle Joseph, Applicant
v.
Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, et al.
Docketed:May 7, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-11037)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 05 2025Application (24A1076) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 7, 2025 to August 21, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 08 2025Application (24A1076) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 6, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

GDUBINSKY@HSGLLP.COM
646-837-8554
Party name: MaChelle Joseph