No. 24A1072
Title:Gary Pisner, Applicant
v.
Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland
Docketed:May 6, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(23)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 04 2025Application (24A1072) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2025 to August 2, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
May 08 2025Application (24A1072) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 2, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary Steven Pisner10561 Assembly Drive
Fairfax, VA 22030

gpisner@outlook.com
703-597-6447
Party name: Gary Pisner