No. 24A1071
Title:Stetson Bruce, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 5, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-7061)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2025Application (24A1071) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 28, 2025 to May 30, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 06 2025Application (24A1071) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 30, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stetson Bruce77019-509
USP
P.O. Box 24550
Tucson, AZ 85734

Party name: Stetson Bruce
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States