No. 24A1070
Title:Chatom Primary Care, P.C., et al., Applicants
v.
Merck & Co., Inc.
Docketed:May 5, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3089)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2025Application (24A1070) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 11, 2025 to July 10, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 07 2025Application (24A1070) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 10, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

DEEPAK@GUPTAWESSLER.COM
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Chatom Primary Care, P.C., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, et al.