No. 24A1069
Title:Luis Fernando Puente, Applicant
v.
Eric Guerrero, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:May 5, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-40190)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2024Application (24A1069) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2024 to January 3, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 06 2025Application (24A1069) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 2, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Luis Fernando Puente#2306524
2665 Jovian Motley Blvd.
Lovelady, TX 75851

Party name: Luis Puente