No. 24A1068
Title:Andres Burgara, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 5, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-581)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2025Application (24A1068) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 05 2025Application (24A1068) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Holt Ortiz Alden
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender (C.D. Cal.)
321 E. 2nd Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

holt_alden@fd.org
(213) 894-4679
Party name: Andres Burgara
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America