No. 24A1067
Title:BofI Federal Bank, Applicant
v.
Charles Matthew Erhart
Docketed:May 5, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3065)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2025Application (24A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 25, 2025 to July 24, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
May 05 2025Application (24A1067) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 24, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Polly Towill
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
350 South Grand Avenue, 40th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3460

ptowill@sheppardmullin.com
213.617.5480
Party name: BofI Federal Bank