No. 24A1065
Title:Freedom Foundation, a Washington Nonprofit Corporation, Applicant
v.
International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 117, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3946)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2025Application (24A1065) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 11, 2025 to July 10, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 02 2025Application (24A1065) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 10, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erin E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

ERIN.MURPHY@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Freedom Foundation