No. 24A1064
Title:Robert Mayfield, et al., Applicants
v.
Department of Labor, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-50724)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2025Application (24A1064) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2025 to June 14, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 06 2025Application (24A1064) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 14, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall
Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

LWake@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Robert Mayfield, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Labor, et al.