No. 24A1062
Title:Fiyyaz Pirani, Applicant
v.
Slack Technologies, Inc., et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16419)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2025Application (24A1062) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 11, 2025 to July 10, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 02 2025Application (24A1062) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 10, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

krussell@russellwoofter.com
2022408433
Party name: Fiyyaz Pirani