No. 24A1061
Title:Andrea Nicole Weetly, Applicant
v.
Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, et al.
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of California
   Case Numbers:(S288933)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2025Application (24A1061) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2025 to May 24, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
May 02 2025Application (24A1061) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 24, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Nicole Weetly16637 Crape Myrtle Lane
Whittier, CA 90603

anweetly@gmail.com
Party name: Andrea Weetly