No. 24A1060
Title:Martin Castillo-Quinones, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-13952)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2025Application (24A1060) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 28, 2025 to May 28, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
May 02 2025Application (24A1060) denied by Justice Thomas.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gus Michael Centrone
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 340952
Tampa, FL 33694

gus@guscentrone.com
540-460-1051
Party name: Martin Castillo-Quinones
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States