No. 24A1059 | |
Title: | Kristi Noem, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al., Applicants v. National TPS Alliance, et al. |
Docketed: | May 1, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (25-2120) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 01 2025 | Application (24A1059) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 01 2025 | Response to application (24A1059) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 5 p.m. (EDT) on May 8, 2025. |
May 07 2025 | Amicus brief of Immigration Reform Law Institute submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Amicus brief of Immigration Law Scholars submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Amicus brief of Members of Congress submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Response of National TPS Alliance, et al. to application submitted. |
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Amicus brief of America's Future, Citizens United, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Ahilan T. Arulanantham Counsel of Record | UCLA SCHOOL OF LAW 385 Charles Young Drive East Los Angeles, CA 90095 ARULANANTHAM@LAW.UCLA.EDU | (310) 825-1029 |
Party name: National TPS Alliance, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Robert Seungchul Chang Counsel of Record | Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality UC Irvine School of Law 401 E. Peltason Drive Irvine, CA 92697 rchang@law.uci.edu | 2063905676 |
Party name: Members of Congress | ||
Christopher J. Hajec Counsel of Record | Immigration Reform Law Institute 25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335 Washington, DC 20001 CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG | 202-232-5590 |
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute | ||
Anne Lai Counsel of Record | UC Irvine School of Law 501 E. Peltason Dr. Irvine, CA 92697-8000 alai@law.uci.edu | (949) 824-9894 |
Party name: Immigration Law Scholars | ||
Jeremiah Lee Morgan Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Avenue West Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180-5615 wjo@mindspring.com | 7033565070 |
Party name: America's Future, Citizens United, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund |