No. 24A1058
Title:Derrick Lloyd, Applicant
v.
Robert Morton
Docketed:May 1, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-357)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2025Application (24A1058) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 29, 2025 to June 28, 2025, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 02 2025Application (24A1058) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 30, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Derrick Lloyd#11A2684
Eastern NY Correctional Facility
P.O. Box 338
Napanoch, NY 12458-0338

Party name: Derrick Lloyd