No. 24A1056
Title:Jack R. T. Jordan, Applicant
v.
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Docketed:May 1, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-90007)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2025Application (24A1056) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 7, 2025 to May 28, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 02 2025Application (24A1056) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 28, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jack Jordan3102 Howell St.
North Kansas City, MO 64116

(816) 853-1142
Party name: Jack R. T. Jordan
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit