No. 24A1055
Title:Anthony Lemicy, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:May 1, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2901)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2025Application (24A1055) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 17, 2025 to June 16, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 02 2025Application (24A1055) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 16, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anthony Lemicy#49801-086
USP Terre Haute
P.O. Box 33
Terre Haute, IN 47808

Party name: Anthony Lemicy
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States