No. 24A1053
Title:Brittany Valencia Martin, Applicant
v.
South Carolina
Docketed:April 30, 2025
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of South Carolina
   Case Numbers:(2022-001444)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1053) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 13, 2025 to July 12, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 02 2025Application (24A1053) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 12, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Allen Chaney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union of South Carolina
P.O. Box 1668
Columbia, SC 29202

achaney@aclusc.org
8643726681
Party name: Brittany Martin