No. 24A1052
Title:Lawrence Watson, Applicant
v.
Kash Patel, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-30202)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2025Application (24A1052) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
May 01 2025Application (24A1052) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence Byron WatsonP.O. Box 1331
Metairie, LA 70004

(617) 708-5018
Party name: Lawrence Watson
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Patel, Kash, et al.