No. 24A1051
Title:Laurel D. Libby, et al., Applicants
v.
Ryan M. Fecteau, Speaker of the Maine House of Representatives, et al.
Docketed:April 30, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(25-1385)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2025Application (24A1051) for Injunction Pending Appeal, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 01 2025Response to application (24A1051) requested by Justice Jackson, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on May 8, 2025.
May 08 2025Response to application from respondent Ryan M. Fecteau, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2025Amicus brief of State of West Virginia and 14 Other States submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

TAYLOR@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
703-243-9423
Party name: Laurel D. Libby, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Maine Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

kimberly.patwardhan@maine.gov
2076268570
Party name: Ryan M. Fecteau, et al.
Other
Michael Ray Williams
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex, Bldg. 1, Rm E-26
1900 Kanawha Blvd. E
Charleston, WV 25305

michael.r.williams@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 14 Other States