No. 24A1050
Title:Joseph Very Sherman, Individually, By Their Biological Father, Next Friend, and Natural Guardian of H. M. S., J. C. S., and M. R. S., Minor Children, et al., Applicants
v.
Virginia
Docketed:April 30, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(240632)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 28 2025Application (24A1050) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 13, 2025 to July 12, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 05 2025Application (24A1050) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 12, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeremy Paul Hopkins
    Counsel of Record
Cranfill Sumner
5440 Wade Park Boulevard
Suite 300
Raleigh, NC 27607

jhopkins@cshlaw.com
(919) 863-8819
Party name: H.M.S., J.C.S., and M.R.S., minor children, individually, by their biological father, next friend, and natural guardian, Joseph Very Sherman, et al.