No. 24A1048
Title:Jeffrey Nines, Warden, et al., Applicants
v.
Charles Brandon Martin
Docketed:April 29, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-6086)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1048) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 01 2025Application (24A1048) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew John DiMiceli
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Pl.
Baltimore, MD 21202

adimiceli@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-6422
Party name: Jeffrey Nines, et al.