No. 24A1047
Title:Joan Doe, Applicant
v.
Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas, in their Official Capacity, et al.
Docketed:April 29, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-1035)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1047) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
Apr 29 2025Application (24A1047) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joan Doe
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 322
Fayetteville, AR 72702

sunshinecharlie13@yahoo.com
Party name: Joan Doe