No. 24A1046
Title:Barings L.L.C., et al., Applicants
v.
Excluded Lenders, et al.
Docketed:April 29, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-20181, 23-20450, 23-20363, 23-20451)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1046) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 19, 2025 to July 18, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 01 2025Application (24A1046) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 18, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1700 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

MMCGILL@GIBSONDUNN.COM
202-887-3680
Party name: Barings LLC, et al.