No. 24A1045
Title:Damon Neal Dunbar, Jr., Applicant
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:April 29, 2025
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2025-4)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2025Application (24A1045) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 27, 2025 to June 26, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Apr 29 2025Application (24A1045) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 26, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Damon Neal Dunbar Jr.
    Counsel of Record
#554556
Oklahoma State Reformatory
P.O. Box 514
Granite, OK 73547

Party name: Damon N. Dunbar