No. 24A1041
Title:Qinghua Zhang, et al., Applicants
v.
Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka
Docketed:April 28, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-3029)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2025Application (24A1041) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2025 to July 13, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 28 2025Application (24A1041) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 14, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Qinghua Zhang13712 E. Caley Ave.
Centennial, CO 80111

zqhzqh@gmail.com
(785) 979-5068
Party name: Qinghua Zhang, et al.