No. 24A1040 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Nicholas Bernard Acklin, Applicant
v.
John Q. Hamm, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:April 28, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-13599)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2025Application (24A1040) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 11, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Apr 29 2025Application (24A1040) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Boland Admirand
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

madmirand@schr.org
404-688-1202
Party name: Nicholas Acklin