No. 24A1039
Title:Mason Binion, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:April 28, 2025
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(22-CF-0116)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1039) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2025 to July 7, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 30 2025Application (24A1039) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 7, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Ian Kravis
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW, Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001

Jonathan.Kravis@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Mason Binion
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States