No. 24A1038
Title:Dominique Ashley Childs, Applicant
v.
Virginia
Docketed:April 28, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-7227)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2025Application (24A1038) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 5, 2025 to July 4, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Apr 29 2025Application (24A1038) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 4, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominique Ashley Childs
    Counsel of Record
#1106367
VADOC Centralized Mail Dist. Ctr.
3521 Woods Way
State Farm, VA 23160

Party name: Dominique A. Childs