No. 24A1035
Title:Huy Trong Tran, Applicant
v.
Brian Cates, Warden
Docketed:April 25, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-3176)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2025Application (24A1035) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2025 to June 23, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 28 2025Application (24A1035) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 23, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Huy Trong Tran#AB1640/4B3R-63
P.O. Box 1905
Tehachapi, CA 93581

Party name: Huy Trong Tran