No. 24A1033
Title:Margaret Paulone, Applicant
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:April 24, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Western District
   Case Numbers:(168 WAL 2024)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2025Application (24A1033) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 6, 2025 to July 5, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Apr 25 2025Application (24A1033) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 5, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Margaret Palone354 Marbury Drive
North Huntingdon, PA 15642

wintersolstace@hotmail.com
724-757-9508
Party name: Margaret Paulone