No. 24A1018
Title:Dominick Bailey, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:April 22, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1685)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2025Application (24A1018) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2025 to July 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 22 2025Application (24A1018) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until July 11, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David James Nathanson
    Counsel of Record
Jellison & Nathanson, LLP
55 Union St. 4th Floor
Boston, MA 02108

dnathanson@jndefense.com
617-248-1806
Party name: Dominick Bailey
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America