No. 24A1015
Title:Brandon Phillips, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:April 21, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2678)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2025Application (24A1015) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 28, 2025 to May 28, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 21 2025Application (24A1015) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until May 28, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Enriquez
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

paul.enriquez.law@gmail.com
202-662-6000
Party name: Brandon Phillips
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States