No. 24A1004
Title:Cirrus Design Corporation, Applicant
v.
Great Western Air, LLC, dba Cirrus Aviation Services, LLC
Docketed:April 18, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-15157)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2025Application (24A1004) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 30, 2025 to May 30, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Apr 21 2025Application (24A1004) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 30, 2025.
May 16 2025Application of Cirrus Design Corporation for a further extension of time submitted.
Written RequestProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Cirrus Design Corporation