No. 24A10
Title:Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya, Applicant
v.
James B. Murray, Jr., in His Official Capacity as Rector of the Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia, et al.
Docketed:July 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1999, 22-2064)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2024Application (24A10) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 14, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 09 2024Application (24A10) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington,, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya